Tushinski, Daniel Mark (CPSO#: 88546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St.
B3 - 133
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43936
Fax: (905)525-0300
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel M. Tushinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tushinski ( CPSO# 88546 )

Business Address:
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone Number: (705) 418-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MARK TUSHINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUSHINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013