Tyler, James Barry (CPSO#: 97465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 002
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 792-2145
Fax: (705) 792-2147
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie After-Hours Clinic
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tyler ( CPSO# 97465 )

Business Address:
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 002
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 792-2145

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  James  Barry Tyler may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.