Tyndall, Mark William (CPSO#: 56010)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Tyndall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015