Tyndel, Felix Joseph (CPSO#: 31763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone: (416) 773-0418
Fax: (416) 773-0109
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Tyndel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tyndel ( CPSO# 31763 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 773-0418

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FELIX JOSEPH TYNDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYNDEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1980