Ukpeh, Henry Asuquo (CPSO#: 61618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ilorin, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Outpatient Clinic
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 740 8055
Fax: 705 740 8004
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Ukpeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ukpeh ( CPSO# 61618 )

Business Address:
Pediatric Outpatient Clinic
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
304 - 272 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 775-0195

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY ASUQUO UKPEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UKPEH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1994