Uljanitski, Sofia (CPSO#: 81421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building A
9401 Jane Street
suite 206
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone: (905) 303-8490
Fax: (905) 832-0093
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Uljanitski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Uljanitski ( CPSO# 81421 )

Business Address:
Building A
Suite 206
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (647) 262-6016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOFIA ULJANITSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULJANITSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006