Ullman, Doris Brigitte (CPSO#: 52033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Woodlands Medical Centre
40 Shellington Place
Suite 204
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: (519) 759-6116
Fax: (519) 759-7727
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doris B. Ullman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ullman ( CPSO# 52033 )

Business Address:
North Woodlands Medical Centre
40 Shellington Place
Suite 204
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 759-6116

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIS BRIGITTE ULLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULLMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985