Un, Victor Chi Chung (CPSO#: 65882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Un Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Un ( CPSO# 65882 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6002

Business Address:
551 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 485-5000

Business Address:
225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Business Address:
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 222-2192

Business Address:
345 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR CHI CHUNG UN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1994