Ung, Berton Yee-Kwong (CPSO#: 67145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, French, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1256 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1E5
Phone: (416) 261-3500
Fax: (416) 266-9400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Berton Ung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2008

Dr. B. Ung ( CPSO# 67145 )

Business Address:
1256 Danforth Road
Toronto ON  M1J 1E5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. BERTON YEE-KWONG UNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995