Unger, Walter Peter (CPSO#: 19701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
710 Park Ave
New York NY  10021
United States
Phone: 212 249 9393
Fax: 212 249 4032
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walter P. Unger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER PETER UNGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1965