Upenieks, Richard Leonard (CPSO#: 58416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: 519 744 3311
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor Richard Upenieks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Upenieks ( CPSO# 58416 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD LEONARD UPENIEKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPENIEKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988