Ursel, Peter Geoffrey (CPSO#: 56561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 328-1747
Fax: (705) 328-1650
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1614 Dundas Street East #101
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y8
Canada
Phone: (888) 546-8179
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ursel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ursel ( CPSO# 56561 )

Business Address:
1614 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y8
Phone Number: (905) 438-9000

Business Address:
Suite 3 and 4
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 328-1747

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Sep 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Sep 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  September 27, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Geoffrey Ursel,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ursel to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Peter Geoffrey Ursel has chosen to no longer engage in liposuction.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
            .