Vachet, Mylene Joanne (CPSO#: 58378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Équipe de Santé Familiale
2741 Rue Chamberland
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mylene Vachet Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vachet ( CPSO# 58378 )

Business Address:
2741 Rue Chamberland
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone Number: (613) 446-7677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYLENE JOANNE VACHET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VACHET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1989