Vaideswaran, Sangeeta (CPSO#: 68046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:Ranchi University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

499 Oxfford St East
London ON  N5Y 3H8
Canada
Phone: 519 672 1495
Fax: 519 434 3048
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANGEETA VAIDESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAIDESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996