Valadka, Mikas Algis (CPSO#: 51863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Lithuanian

Education:Julius Maximilian University at Wurzburg, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
2299 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 1X7
Phone: (416) 769-2415
Fax: (416) 767-5337
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Valadka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Valadka ( CPSO# 51863 )

Business Address:
401 - 2299 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 769-2415

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIKAS ALGIS VALADKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALADKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 1980 to 15 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1983