Valadka, Saulius Mikas (CPSO#: 76159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6243
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valadka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Valadka ( CPSO# 76159 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAULIUS MIKAS VALADKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALADKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2007