Van Alphen, Katarina Maria (CPSO#: 56393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1415 1st Ave West
suite 2000
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4058
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. M. Van Alphen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Van Alphen ( CPSO# 56393 )

Business Address:
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATARINA MARIA VAN ALPHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ALPHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1986