Van Straalen, Rosemary Teresa (CPSO#: 63509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trafalgar Medical Centre
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Straalen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Van Straalen ( CPSO# 63509 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSEMARY TERESA VAN STRAALEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN STRAALEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992