Van Vliet, Meghan Christine (CPSO#: 89238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7S6
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meghan Van Vliet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Vliet ( CPSO# 89238 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7S6
Phone Number: (519) 621-9180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHAN CHRISTINE VAN VLIET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN VLIET is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013