Vance, Alan Ross (CPSO#: 27427)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Vance Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 26 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Document Storage (ODS) PO Box 2071 Sudbury , Ontario P3A 4R8 Phone: (705) 560-8461 Fax: (705) 524-8012 Email: odstorage@persona.ca
Date Received: 26 Oct 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014