Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Vandenberg, Theodorus Anthony (CPSO#: 51991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Suite A3-944
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8808
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theodore Vandenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vandenberg ( CPSO# 51991 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
Room A3 944
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORUS ANTHONY VANDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983