Vandermorris, Ashley Kate (CPSO#: 91222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: Morris, Ashley Kate (used until: 26 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Adolescent Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228605
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard St East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: 416-922-0566
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY KATE VANDERMORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERMORRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2014