Vandeyar, Thivian (CPSO#: 86923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Affairs
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Fax: (519) 631-4106
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thivian Vandeyar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vandeyar ( CPSO# 86923 )

Business Address:
Medical Affairs
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 04 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THIVIAN VANDEYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEYAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009