Vanvat, Jarnail Singh (CPSO#: 83372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandalwood Medical Centre
Unit 5
2945 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone: (905) 463-1337
Fax: (905) 463-1338
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.S. Vanvat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vanvat ( CPSO# 83372 )

Business Address:
Sandalwood Medical Centre
Unit 5
2945 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 463-1337

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JARNAIL SINGH VANVAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANVAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2007