Varadi, Robert Gabriel (CPSO#: 83060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Healthcare Centre
Department of Respiratory Medicine
82 Buttonwood Ave
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3631
Fax: (416) 243-3696
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing, Room 7E-446
399 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5499
Fax: (416) 603-3456
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 11 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GABRIEL VARADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006