Varapravan, Sreelatha Panicker (CPSO#: 81379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building
Assessment Program - H4
PO Box 5777, STN B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47061
Fax: (519) 452-4552
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sreelatha Varapravan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Varapravan ( CPSO# 81379 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Building
550 Wellington Street
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SREELATHA PANICKER VARAPRAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARAPRAVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2009