Varma, Parag Victor (CPSO#: 70235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Victor Varma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Varma ( CPSO# 70235 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARAG VICTOR VARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2004