Varma, Sonal (CPSO#: 86670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Mahatma Gandhi Memorial Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6035
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonal Varma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Varma ( CPSO# 86670 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
DOUG-2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONAL VARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012