Vasey, Kirsten Nicole (CPSO#: 77847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2485 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1L5
Phone: 1-800-387-0750
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasey Odrcich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Odrcich ( CPSO# 76156 )
Dr. K. Vasey ( CPSO# 77847 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
194 Talbot West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN NICOLE VASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004