Vayalumkal, Antony Joseph (CPSO#: 28855)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Utkal University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Antony J. Vayalumkal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hamilton Academy of Medicine Suite 206 1 Yonge Street Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017