Velicaria, Kevin (CPSO#: 103916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit #1, 1440 Main Street E
Hamilton ON  L8K 6M3
Phone: (905) 547-8915
Fax: (905) 547-3785
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Velicaria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Velicaria ( CPSO# 103916)

Business Address:
107 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 627-3505

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN VELICARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELICARIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016