Velker, Vikram Machindra (CPSO#: 93601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
Room A3 811
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8600 Ext. 53347
Fax: (519) 685-8736
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Velker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Velker ( CPSO# 93601 )
Dr. B. Velker ( CPSO# 100642)

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
Room A4 901A
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM MACHINDRA VELKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015