Velos, Pamela (CPSO#: 31613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Fletcher Cres
PO Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-3377
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Velos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Velos ( CPSO# 31613 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-3377

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Cyprus

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA VELOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980