Venantius, Michelle Ann (CPSO#: 84304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
123 James Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Phone: (905) 667-4848
Fax: (905) 667-4872
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mood Disorders Clinic
SJHH West 5th Campus
100 West 5th St
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 388-2511
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St. W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. DS Sehdev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sehdev ( CPSO# 84538 )
Dr. M. Venantius ( CPSO# 84304 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton International Airport
Hangar 4
9300 Airport Road
Mount Hope ON  L0R 1W0
Phone Number: (289) 426-1133


Corporation Name: Dr. M Venantius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sehdev ( CPSO# 84538 )
Dr. M. Venantius ( CPSO# 84304 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
123 James Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Phone Number: (905) 667-4848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANN VENANTIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENANTIUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014