Venkatesh, Vikram (CPSO#: 82995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300 Ext. 5912
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vikram Venkatesh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Venkatesh ( CPSO# 82995 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM VENKATESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKATESH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010