Vennettilli, Marco Claudio (CPSO#: 82432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite LL2
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-8801
Fax: (705) 797-8808
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vennettilli Moldes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moldes ( CPSO# 82698 )
Dr. M. Vennettilli ( CPSO# 82432 )

Business Address:
Prenatal Well Baby Clinic
304-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Business Address:
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite LL2
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-8801

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3324

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCO CLAUDIO VENNETTILLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENNETTILLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010