Ventresca, Mario Robert (CPSO#: 52019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
248 Killaly Street West
Port Colborne ON  L3K 6A6
Phone: (905) 834-5611
Fax: (905) 834-5612
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mario R. Ventresca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ventresca ( CPSO# 52019 )

Business Address:
248 Killaly Street West
Port Colborne ON  L3K 6A6
Phone Number: (905) 834-5611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIO ROBERT VENTRESCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENTRESCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Sep 1989
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1983