Vera Silva, Victor Antonio (CPSO#: 66296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Nacional De Trujillo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
474 College ST, Suite 206
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone: (647) 350-8008
Fax: (647) 350-8009
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Antonio Vera Silva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Vera Silva ( CPSO# 66296 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
474 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1A4
Phone Number: (647) 350-8008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR ANTONIO VERA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERA SILVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002