Verhaeghe, Carol Rebecca (CPSO#: 71573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
370 Bayview Drive
Suite 118
Barrie ON  L4N 2L3
Phone: (705) 735-4685
Fax: (705) 735-4684
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

606060 River Rd
Mulmer, Ontario
PO Box 159 Shelburne
Shelburne ON  L9V 3L8
Canada
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

RVH- 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Verhaeghe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Verhaeghe ( CPSO# 71573 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Whispering Pines Retirement Home
140 Letitia Street
Barrie ON  L4N 1P5
Phone Number: (705) 722-4200

Business Address:
Suite 118
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone Number: (705) 735-4685

Business Address:
Pine River Institute
606060 River Road
Mulmur ON  L9V 0S9
Phone Number: (519) 925-9225

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL REBECCA VERHAEGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERHAEGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1999