Vezina, Claude Theodore (CPSO#: 30692)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claude Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 May 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 2017