Viana, Ricardo (CPSO#: 88375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Physical Medicine & Rehabilitation
4th Floor
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4000 Ext. 45027
Fax: (519) 685-4009
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Viana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Viana ( CPSO# 88375 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Department of Physical Medicine and Rehab
4th Floor
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 29 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICARDO VIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013