Vickers, Janet Anne (CPSO#: 58169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Family Practice Assoc
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 205
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-8144
Fax: (905) 820-1631
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vickers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vickers ( CPSO# 58169 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Family Practice Assoc
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 205
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-8144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ANNE VICKERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICKERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1988