Viegas, Aiza E (CPSO#: 82481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctors Office
1011 Upper Middle Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 4L2
Phone: (905) 849-7007
Fax: (905) 849-7883
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aiza Viegas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Viegas ( CPSO# 82481 )

Business Address:
The Doctors Office
1011 Upper Middle Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 4L2
Phone Number: (905) 849-7007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIZA E VIEGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIEGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007