Vilcini, Michelle Marie (CPSO#: 63745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
P O Box 4200
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4520
Fax: (705) 743-2997
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Partners in Pregnancy Clinic
Suite 302
170 Simcoe Road
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 741-1191
Fax: (705) 741-1192
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Vilcini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vilcini ( CPSO# 63745 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE MARIE VILCINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILCINI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1992