Viljoen, Johan (CPSO#: 66263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th floor Womens and Babies
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-8395
Fax: (905) 684-4717
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johan Viljoen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Viljoen ( CPSO# 66263 )

Business Address:
4th Floor
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-8395

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHAN VILJOEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILJOEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1993

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On February 3, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Viljoen.