Villalobos Vazquez, Alejandra (CPSO#: 102292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De Guadalajara, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Geriatric Medicine
10 Trench Street
Referral Atte to Senior Wellness
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 3889
Fax: (905) 883-2181
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

122 Cornell Park Avenue Unit 1
Atte AGING AT HOME PROGRAM
Internal Referrals only
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905 471 9999
Fax: 905 209 1501
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

19-13085 Yonge Street Suite 406
Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4E0K2
Canada
Phone: (647) 951-4823
Fax: (905) 508-8027
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alejandra Villalobos Vazquez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Villalobos Vazquez ( CPSO# 102292)

Business Address:
Suite 406
19-13085 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K2
Phone Number: (647) 951-4823

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Alejandra  Villalobos  Vazquez  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            geriatric medicine.