Vincent, Franklynne Kendra (CPSO#: 54574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 232 Sunnyside Wing West
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6095
Fax: (416) 530-6184
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George M. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Vincent ( CPSO# 54574 )
Dr. G. Vincent ( CPSO# 52561 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 234
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANKLYNNE KENDRA VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1991