Vinson, Robert Stanley (CPSO#: 50736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A7
Phone: (519) 421-4204 Ext. 2031
Fax: (519) 421-4241
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert S. Vinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vinson ( CPSO# 50736 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT STANLEY VINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1983