Voegelin, Richard Edward (CPSO#: 32932)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard E. Voegelin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 684664 Valleyfield Drive Woodstock ON N4S 7V7
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015