Vokey, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 66152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan E. Vokey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vokey ( CPSO# 66152 )

Business Address:
2 - 2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH VOKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOKEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1992